Governing document Friends of Acorns
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/07/1992 AS AMENDED ON 06/10/2009 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/2011 as amended on 24 Jul 2019 as amended on 28 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
The objectives of the Association are to: • Enrich the learning and development experience for children within the Early Year’s Foundation Stage (EYFS), this includes the children between 0-5 years who attend Acorns Pre-School, Reception class of Christian Malford Primary School. • Enhance the learning and development environment for children within the EYFS within Christian Malford and adjoining communities as appropriate • Build relationships between parents, staff and associated community groups within Christian Malford • Raise funds to enrich the opportunities for Early Years Stage children in Christian Malford by organising fund raising and social activities.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.