Trustees EDMUND WALLER P.T.A
Charity number: 1031811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claudine Scheer | Chair | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Ostrowska | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Lynch | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mhairi Guild | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jemma Jones | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Devonshire | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Davies | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Morgan Lloyd Malcolm | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Inez Murphy | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leah Canhoto | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jo Travers | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julia Crawshaw | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Paula Flack | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.