Trustees LOWER WILLINGDON PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY
Charity number: 1032239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS DEBBIE BROADY | Chair | 01 January 2000 |
|
|
||||
Alyson Clay | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Langford | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Lynn | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Mainstone-Ryan | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shanie Winter | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natascha Gordon | Trustee | 18 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alice Francis | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Elmer | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Doughty-Lee | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Miller-Cook | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sonya Hammond | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.