18TH ST ALBANS SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1032693
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £30.15k £31.82k £31.18k £40.08k £30.52k
Total expenditure £30.56k £31.00k £32.66k £39.28k £33.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A