Trustees ST CUTHBERTS PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1033385

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LISA MOULD | Chair | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Rogers | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Knight | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harriett Ponsford | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Grocott | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charis Knapp | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Holly Walker | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
CLARE BLANDFORD | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
HAYLEY MARSH | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA CLANNACHAN | Trustee | 28 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
VILMA COOKE | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DENISE WALKER | Trustee | 23 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.