Trustees EAST FARLEIGH PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1033652
Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN SHEARMAN | Chair | 21 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Kimberly Shrubsole | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Burgess | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Excell | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Jones | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karl Crisp | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Twinam | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH SHEARMAN | Trustee | 16 October 2009 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.