TRELECH WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1033945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £1.26k £1.01k £2.16k £1.31k £786
Total expenditure £1.12k £2.02k £1.29k £766 £490
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A