Financial history HOLYBOURNE WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1034142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.57k £946 £1.05k £1.09k £1.09k
Total expenditure £1.75k £851 £844 £526 £111
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A