Financial history BRIDGE YOUTH PROJECT TRUST

Charity number: 1034800
Charity reporting is overdue by 215 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £129.71k £169.22k £172.70k £172.78k £7.23k
Total expenditure £146.26k £153.10k £174.44k £178.49k £6
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £1.40k N/A N/A