Trustees 53RD COVENTRY (BERKSWELL) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1034873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN PAGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christopher James Naylor | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Grace Bishop | Trustee | 26 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Louise Walker | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Goonwardane Brown | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Davison | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
CONNOR O'TOOLE | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
DONALD LEON BISHOP | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN PAGE | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH ISABEL APPLEGARTH | Trustee | 28 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
EWEN PETER MALCOLM PHILLIPS | Trustee | 28 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL ALAN FOSTER | Trustee | 28 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
LYNNE PAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN TALBOYS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMAN FRANCIS THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.