Trustees CUSTOM HOUSE AND CANNING TOWN COMMUNITY RENEWAL PROJECT

Charity number: 1035200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SARAH RUIZ Chair
None on record
Elizabeth Booker Trustee 08 February 2019
None on record
Adrian Hodgson Trustee 10 December 2018
MERCHANT NAVY WELFARE BOARD
Received: On time
Amala Corera Trustee 26 October 2015
None on record
Freda Ayres Trustee 19 December 2013
None on record
Dr FRANK ROSILLO-CALLE Trustee 23 March 2011
THERE MUST BE AN ALTERNATIVE (THEMBA)
Received: On time
LORRAINE STARKE Trustee
None on record
JANET MOFFATT Trustee
None on record