Trustees SOMERSET SINGERS
Charity number: 1035421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Virginia Waters | Chair | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sally Heslop | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Spencer Macdonald | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Biddlecombe | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Myra Ellis | Trustee | 14 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Kastner | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Jane Lewis | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jill Lewis | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Austen Biddlecombe | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.