Financial history BRIDGE HOUSE ESTATES

Charity number: 1035628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £42.60m £43.10m £46.60m £47.40m £3.41m
Total expenditure £53.30m £53.10m £62.80m £89.60m £66.60m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £175.00k £1.00m £803.21k £200.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £200.00k £1.80m £15.40m £200.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £6.50m £6.80m £6.70m £500.00k £3.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £35.90m £35.10m £37.90m £30.40m £30.40m
Income - Other £200.00k £1.00m £200.00k £1.10m £400.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £31.70m £30.70m £46.40m £72.30m £49.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £20.90m £21.50m £15.30m £15.00m £15.30m
Expenditure - Governance £400.00k £600.00k £700.00k £600.00k £1.20m
Expenditure - Grants institution £24.40m £0 £30.70m £58.60m £33.30m
Expenditure - Investment management £15.40m £15.10m £15.30m £5.90m £8.40m
Expenditure - Other £700.00k £900.00k £1.10m £2.30m £2.30m