Trustees TOY HOUSE LIBRARIES ASSOCIATION OF TOWER HAMLETS
Charity number: 1036738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Mary Cox | Chair | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Wenkana Lu | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fatimah Jobber | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Renne Ann Lawrence | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Halon Iqbal | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rahman Zenith | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sian Harris | Trustee | 16 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Toby James Evans | Trustee | 21 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOY HASTINGS | Trustee | 10 October 2008 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Jean Whitehead | Trustee | 10 October 2000 |
|
|
||||
KALSOOM KHAN | Trustee | 10 October 1998 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.