COLLIS SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 20 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 20 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 04 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 04 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 29 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 08 October 2017 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 08 October 2017 130 days late Download