Financial history CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY SEVENOAKS

Charity number: 1037106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £88.09k £40.34k £65.37k £42.52k £76.71k
Total expenditure £56.72k £44.20k £43.31k £40.32k £49.70k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A