MARY KINGSLEY ZOCHONIS LECTURE TRUST

Charity number: 1037233
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Other income £473 £534 £487 £438 £547
Total expenditure £758 £167 £2.41k £0 £2.23k