4TH EPPING FOREST SOUTH (BANCROFT'S SCHOOL) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1037676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.94k £12.65k £20.70k £24.07k £6.86k
Total expenditure £17.24k £13.80k £19.69k £23.36k £6.81k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A