HIGHWAY CHURCH

Charity number: 1038185
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £235.82k £124.06k £166.30k £137.94k £188.43k
Total expenditure £84.94k £89.35k £104.65k £124.38k £80.50k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £600 N/A