Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST. FRANCIS CHURCH (1994)

Charity number: 1038292
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £0 £703 £106 £115 £137
Total expenditure £0 £202 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A