Governing document UNITED KINGDOM COUNCIL ON DEAFNESS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/04/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/09/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/12/2011
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND EXTEND CO-OPERATION BETWEEN MEMBER ORGANISATIONS IN REPRESENTING AND PROMOTING THE INTERESTS OF DEAF, DEAFENED, HARD OF HEARING AND DEAF-BLIND CHILDREN AND ADULTS AND THEIR FAMILIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.