Trustees THE WARWICK DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1038532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annette Clare Johnson | Chair | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Meeks | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Hemming | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PIGGOTT | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Cronin | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sam Sexton | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ann Bailey | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHARON HANCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.