Financial history SHERBORNE ST JOHN SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1038635
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £8.72k £9.22k £7.59k £19.74k £7.51k
Total expenditure £13.86k £8.93k £3.95k £1.89k £27.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.50k N/A