Financial history THE DISTILLERS' CHARITY

Charity number: 1038763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £106.85k £308.42k £104.02k £224.64k £128.16k
Total expenditure £41.94k £159.12k £56.53k £224.86k £93.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A