Governance FRIENDS OF BEECROFT GARDEN PRIMARY SCHOOL
Charity number: 1038934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 30 June 1994: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 July 2011: Re-registered
- 09 June 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 13 June 2013: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- FOBS (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF BROCKLEY SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.