THE REDDITCH ASSOCIATION FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 1038940
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £43.75k £11.21k £12.72k £11.00k £16.82k
Total expenditure £40.55k £11.74k £11.24k £15.20k £17.54k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £450 £0 N/A £500