Governing document EARL MOUNTBATTEN HOSPICE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/05/1994 AS AMENDED ON 31 JAN 200, 29 JAN 2001, 28 JAN 2002, 10/06/2004 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/11/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/09/2014 as amended on 19 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
3.1 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST PERSONS DIAGNOSED AS SUFFERING FROM A TERMINAL ILLNESS, BY SUCH WHOLLY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 3.2 TO OFFER SUPPORT AND RELIEF TO RELATIVES AND DEPENDENTS OF SUCH PERSONS BOTH BEFORE AND AFTER BEREAVEMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.