Accounts and annual returns NORTH LONDON COLLEGES EUROPEAN NETWORK
Charity number: 1039379
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2009 | 16 June 2010 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 16 June 2010 | 381 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2007 | 03 June 2008 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2007 | 03 June 2008 | 3 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2006 | 18 January 2008 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2006 | 30 April 2007 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2005 | 23 May 2006 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2005 | 26 May 2006 | On time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window