Trustees BOUGHTON MONCHELSEA AMENITY TRUST
Charity number: 1039498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Green | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
Stewart Lane | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|||||||
Roy Garland | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr CAROLINE JESSEL | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
ANDY HUMPHRYES | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID REDFEARN | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT EDMANS | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Martin | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|||||||
WILLIAM BROWN | Trustee | 14 January 2013 |
|
|||||||
LEON DATE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MR DOUG SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.