Financial history AZAN DAWAH AND COMMUNITY SERVICES

Charity number: 1039524
Charity reporting is overdue by 136 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £48.57k £41.15k £52.97k £66.85k £72.95k
Total expenditure £49.55k £52.04k £61.23k £51.47k £55.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A