THE ST. ANDREW'S NETHER WALLOP CHURCH BUILDING TRUST

Charity number: 1039792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.82k £4.06k £4.26k £4.31k £2.91k
Total expenditure £26.71k £477 £1.40k £452 £4.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A