Trustees GRESHAM COLLEGE
Charity number: 1039962

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Loyd Daniel Gilman Grossman | Chair | 01 August 2019 |
|
|||||||
Charles Edward Lord | Trustee | 28 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Ahamed DOWSHAN Humzah | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffrey Cale Matthews | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Michelle Denise Gurney | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|||||||
Johanne Erica DELAHUNTY QC | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
RAYMOND JOHN LONG CB | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||||
DEBORAH CLARE WALKER-ARNOTT CBE | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.