Dogfen lywodraethu WANDSWORTH CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JULY 1994 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 13 JANUARY 1999, 9 JUNE 1999, 24 APRIL 2002, 4 OCTOBER 2006 AND 16 SEPTEMBER 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 OCT 2016 as amended on 22 Nov 2018 as amended on 21 Nov 2018 as amended on 03 Feb 2020 as amended on 22 Mar 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WANDSWORTH AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE PRINCIPAL AREA OF BENEFIT") AND ELSEWHERE IN GREATER LONDON
Maes buddion
THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WANDSWORTH AND SURROUNDING AREAS AND ELSEWHERE IN GREATER LONDON.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.