Financial history THE MARK LEONARD TRUST

Charity number: 1040323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £2.02m £1.05m £1.34m £1.14m £422.42k
Total expenditure £1.58m £1.38m £1.42m £1.11m £1.71m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.33m £500.00k £812.50k £836.97k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £694.61k £509.31k £511.37k £292.32k N/A
Income - Other £229 £38.42k £13.33k £10.00k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.47m £1.28m £1.31m £1.01m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £109.61k £104.61k £106.11k £98.16k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.68k £9.01k £9.51k £13.04k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.28m £1.03m £1.09m £748.03k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £109.61k £104.61k £106.11k £98.16k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A