Trustees SOCIAL ACTION FOR HEALTH
Charity number: 1040496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KARIN PAPPENHEIM | Chair | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tatyana Karpinskaya | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helena Roy | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Batkin | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Murtough | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Alexis Backhouse | Trustee | 08 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pooja Shah | Trustee | 29 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Stranger-Jones | Trustee | 20 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.