Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST CHURCH, YEOVIL, SOMERSET

Charity number: 1040550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.35k £3.29k £3.24k £2.39k £2.17k
Total expenditure £0 £2.43k £4.43k £0 £7.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A