Financial history CAMBRIDGE SPORT LAKES TRUST

Charity number: 1040693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £324.99k £279.27k £449.90k £343.23k £559.73k
Total expenditure £311.64k £352.17k £367.35k £373.07k £396.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £600 £1.20k £1.00k £6.00k £158.95k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £20.03k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £539.70k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £396.61k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £22.79k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0