85TH KINGSWOOD (CHRIST CHURCH, DOWNEND) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1040861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.59k £11.23k £10.26k £10.15k £1.31k
Total expenditure £11.71k £12.12k £13.30k £11.13k £2.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A