Governing document ABERDARE TOWN CENTRE PROJECT/CHEQUERS YOUTH FACILITY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/09/1994 AS AMENDED ON 04/08/1997 AS AMENDED ON 07/07/2003 AS AMENDED ON 20/08/2004 AS AMENDED ON 27/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 26/05/2011
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE OF THE COMMUNITIES WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF CYNON VALLEY BY HELPING AND EDUCATING SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUAL AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED. 2.TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A BUILDING OR BUILDINGS AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
BOUNDARIES OF BOROUGH OF CYNON VALLEY HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS CYNON VALLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.