Financial history WORKAID

Charity number: 1041574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £318.33k £381.67k £438.90k £405.28k £496.36k
Total expenditure £338.22k £404.42k £455.76k £363.39k £467.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £2.60k £56.35k £15.52k