Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST BENET'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1041838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required