Accounts and annual returns ELMSETT AND ALDHAM VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity number: 1042016
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 January 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 January 2024 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1602 days