Governing document EAST SUSSEX DISABILITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED ON 2ND DECEMBER 1996, 19TH OCTOBER 2000, 25TH OCTOBER 2001 AND 25TH APRIL 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF WELFARE SERVICES FOR DISABLED PEOPLE RESIDENT PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WITHIN THE AREA OF THE COUNTY OF EAST SUSSEX WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY EAST SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.