Financial history COLWICH AND HAYWOODS VOLUNTARY TRANSPORT SCHEME

Charity number: 1042089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.18k £2.26k £1.95k £3.49k £0
Total expenditure £1.37k £1.18k £1.22k £3.41k £381
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A