Trustees SALE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1042185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN MCGEOUGH | Chair | 03 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Lewis Sinclair | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Saxty | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Anna Elizabeth Brunt | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Harris | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Lee | Trustee | 21 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Nicol Stark | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Yates Marsden | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE GLEAVES | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Harold Norman Peet | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALFRED CLIVE WINBY | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA LOUISE MORGAN | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Charles Atherall | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL JOHN HARDING | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.