Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST HUGH'S FOOLOW

Charity number: 1042264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £767 £1.03k £606 £105 £74
Total expenditure £0 £0 £1.51k £890 £752
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A