Financial history CURSILLO CYMRU ST ASAPH

Charity number: 1042488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.88k £787 £4.76k £822 £1.02k
Total expenditure £2.26k £489 £5.36k £429 £154
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A