Financial history THE FRIENDS OF HOLY CROSS PREPARATORY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1042539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £43.41k £74.90k £41.95k £118.45k £14.53k
Total expenditure £34.13k £41.30k £103.30k £79.07k £31.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A