Financial history THE ROEBUCK MEMORIAL HOMES

Charity number: 1042683
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £33.37k £33.01k £35.95k £36.21k £37.90k
Total expenditure £30.38k £42.83k £50.68k £37.11k £33.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A