Financial history THE TAIT MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1042797
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £111.91k £136.10k £69.39k £77.51k £105.32k
Total expenditure £78.14k £80.54k £70.57k £69.61k £91.69k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A